California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2015

Amended

Bill April 13, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015