California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill May 16, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016