LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2498
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2498
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2498
Compare Versions
AB2498 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB2498 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB2498 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2498 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 30, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2498 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2498 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2498 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2498 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB2498 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB2498 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2498 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 30, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 21, 2016
AB2498 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2498 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2498 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2498 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare