California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016