California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016