|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6576.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6577.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5568.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5483.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|