California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2505 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2505CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 105 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 25, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 25, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Quirk FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 597u of the Penal Code, relating to animals. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2505, Quirk. Animals: euthanasia. Existing law prohibits a person from killing an animal by using carbon monoxide gas or intracardiac injection of a euthanasia agent on a conscious animal, except as specified. With respect to the killing of a dog or cat, existing law prohibits a person from using a high-altitude decompression chamber or nitrogen gas. Under existing law, a violation of these provisions is a misdemeanor. This bill would, with respect to the killing of a dog or cat, additionally prohibit a person from using carbon dioxide gas. By expanding the scope of an existing crime, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 597u of the Penal Code is amended to read: 597u. (a) A person, peace officer, officer of a humane society, or officer of a pound or animal regulation department of a public agency shall not kill an animal by using either of the following methods: (1) Carbon monoxide gas. (2) Intracardiac injection of a euthanasia agent on a conscious animal, unless the animal is heavily sedated or anesthetized in a humane manner, or comatose, or unless, in light of all the relevant circumstances, the procedure is justifiable. (b) With respect to the killing of a dog or cat, a person, peace officer, officer of a humane society, or officer of a pound or animal regulation department of a public agency shall not use any of the methods specified in subdivision (a) or any of the following methods: (1) High-altitude decompression chamber. (2) Nitrogen gas. (3) Carbon dioxide gas. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.