Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 4460.) | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |