Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4448.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |