Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4362.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |