California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016