|
09/14/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5156.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4686.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|