Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|