Senate | 06/08/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 3. Page 4562.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |