|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 759, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4956.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 4859.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|