Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4864.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|