California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016