07/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/25/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.). | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4362.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |