California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 18, 2015