Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5038.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|