LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2546
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2546
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2546
Compare Versions
AB2546 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB2546 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2546 Amended August 11, 2016
AB2546 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2546 Amended March 17, 2016
AB2546 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2546 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB2546 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2546 Amended August 11, 2016
AB2546 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2546 Amended March 17, 2016
AB2546 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare