California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016