Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|