Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |