LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2551
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2551
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2551
Compare Versions
AB2551 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2551 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 3, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2551 Amended April 27, 2016
AB2551 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2551 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2551 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2551 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 3, 2016
AB2551 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2551 Amended April 27, 2016
AB2551 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2551 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare