Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4501.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|