LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2556
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2556
Compare Versions
AB2556 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2556 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2556 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2556 Amended June 14, 2016
AB2556 Amended April 14, 2016
AB2556 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2556 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2556 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2556 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2556 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2556 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2556 Amended June 14, 2016
AB2556 Amended April 14, 2016
AB2556 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2556 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2556 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare