California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015