California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016