09/13/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 332, Statutes of 2016. | |||
09/13/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/02/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5299.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4461.) | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |