08/26/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2016. | |||
08/26/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4874.). | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4464.) | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |