California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016