|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5273.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5048.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hertzberg. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4686.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|