Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|