BILL NUMBER: AB 2579AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act relating torecycling.sol id waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2579, as amended, Low. Food service packaging products:extended producer responsibility program:study. The California Integrated Waste Management Act of 1989, administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, regulates the disposal, management, and recycling of solid waste. This bill would require the department, on or before January 1, 2018, to complete a study to establish baseline data relating to food service packaging that contains specified information, including the current and potential markets for recycled and composted food service packaging products. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) For purposes of this section, "food service packaging" means single-use packaging products used by food service providers for their customers for food that is prepared onsite. (b) On or before January 1, 2018, the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery shall complete a study to establish baseline data relating to food service packaging. (c) The study required pursuant to subdivision (b) shall contain all of the following information: (1) The amount of food service packaging, by material type, used in California and the disposition of the products, including the percentages recycled, composted, anddisposed,disposed and an estimate of the percentage littered. (2) The facilities located in the state that accept food service packaging for recycling or composting, the citiestheythose facilities serve, and the infrastructure needed to increase the recycling rate to reach California's statewide recycling goal of 75 percent and reduce litter. (3) The current and potential markets for recycled and composted food service packaging products. (4) Barriers to the increased recycling and composting of food service packaging and steps that may be taken to remove those barriers.