California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016