|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1545.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 1214.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|