Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4889.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|