Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 5246.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|