Assembly | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |