Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |