California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 9, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016