California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016