|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6298.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5227.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 4897.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4853.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|