California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2594 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2594AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gordon  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Pavley   )  FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 10561.7 to the Water Code, relating to stormwater. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2594, as amended, Gordon. Stormwater resources: use of captured water. Existing law, the Stormwater Resource Planning Act, authorizes one or more public agencies to develop a stormwater resource plan that meets specified standards to address the capture of stormwater, as defined, and dry weather runoff, as defined. This bill would authorize a public entity that captures stormwater, in accordance with a stormwater resource  plan and consistent with a municipal separate storm sewer system permit,   plan,  before the water reaches a natural channel to use the captured  water.   water under certain circumstances.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10561.7 is added to the Water Code, to read: 10561.7.  (a)    A public entity that captures stormwater, in accordance with a stormwater resource  plan and consistent with a municipal separate storm sewer system permit,   plan,  before the water reaches a natural  channel, as that term is used in Section 1201,   channel  shall be entitled to use the captured  water.   water to the extent that the water augments water supplies supporting existing water rights.   (b) Nothing in this section shall be construed to do any of the following:   (1) Alter or impair any existing rights.   (2) Change existing water rights.   (3) Interfere with, amend, or supersede any existing water rights adjudication or other legally mandated water management plan.   (4) Create a groundwater pumping right where a pumping right does not already exist.