Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4596.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |