|
08/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4874.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|