Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2016 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Read first time. To print. |