California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 2, 2016