LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2615
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2615
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2615
Compare Versions
AB2615 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2615 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB2615 Amended August 17, 2016
AB2615 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2615 Amended June 15, 2016
AB2615 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2615 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2615 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2615 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2615 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2615 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB2615 Amended August 17, 2016
AB2615 Amended August 1, 2016
AB2615 Amended June 15, 2016
AB2615 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2615 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2615 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2615 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare